Showing 3551 items
matching shoulders
-
Port Melbourne Historical & Preservation Society
Photograph - Photograph of Archibald McArthur, Royal Studios Corner Bourke & Swanston Streets, c. 1872
Photograph copied in 1872 from earlier photograph.Head & shoulders photograph of Archibald McARTHUR.1992/10/10archibald mcarthur -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photographic print block
Head and shoulders of three unknown women.On back: "18"glen iris presbyterian church -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, The Rev. Kendall William Eddy
Born 26/2/1924. Ordained 1956. Turiff Home Missionary 1948, Birchip (HM) 1948–49, Mt Isa (Methodist Inland Mission) 1949–51, Drysdale 1952–55, Goroke 1956–57, Sea Lake 1961–65, Avoca 196–67, Strathmore 1967–72, Ballarat West 1973–76, Joined the UCA 1977. Without settlement 1976 while transferred to Rochdale (UK), Boronia, Malvern (6 years), Peterborough (UK). Retired to Geelong in 1989, and died late 1997. Wife: Ruth (4 daughters).Head and shoulders B&W photo."The Rev. Ken Eddy"eddy, kendall w. -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Charles Harris, Undated
Head & shoulders portrait, wearing a suit."Rev. E. Charles Harris, President, Uniting Aboriginal & Islander Christian Congress"harris, charles, aboriginal and islander christian congress -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Anne amos, 01/1985
Anne Amos retired 2010.Head and shoulder photographs of Anne Amos.Identification of the persons.amos, anne -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Profit and the Christian: John Ralph interview, 1984
John Ralph was interviewed by Bernard Long in an article entitled "Profit and the Christian - Bernard Long breakfasts with me at the top and later with folk at the bottom." Ralph was managing director of CRA, chairman of Comalco, at the time.Head and shoulders portrait of John Ralph.Identification of person and source.profit and the christian, long, bernard, church & nation, ralph, john -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Maureen Boaler, 13/03/1985
Mrs. Maureen Boaler was Director of the Share Community Appeal for 1985.Head and shoulders photogarph of Maureen Boaler."Maureen Boaler C&N 13/3/1985 page 13"boaler, maureen, share community appeal -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Reverend Wesley Johns
Reverend Wesley Johns was born in Victoria in 1864 and died in Box Hill in 1933. He commenced his ministry in 1886. He was stationed at Benalla and Euroa 1886, Wodonga 1887 Dromana 1888 Nathalia 1889 Kerang 1890 Horsham 1893 Blackwood 1895 Kilmore 1898 Forth 1901 Wangaratta 1904 Portland 1907 Brighton New Street 1910 North Melbourne 1912 Colac 1916 Ringwood 1921 St Kilda 1924 Oakleigh 1926. He was Financial Secretary of District between 1918 and 1926.B&W photograph head and shoulders.johns, wesley, reverend -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Rod Scoullar, 1984
Rodney Ross Scoullar was born on 02/01/1953 and attended John Knox Presbyterian Church. After studying geology, he began studies at the United Faculty of Theology in 1981. He was ordained at Bentleigh Uniting Church on 17/12/1984. His ministry included Balmoral, Queenscliff High School chaplaincy, Haileybury chaplaincy, and Geelong College chaplaincy. He began placement at Cowes St John's.B&W photograph head and shoulders."Rod Scoullar C&N 30/1/95 pagae 14"scoullar, rod, reverend -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Lyn Barnes xit student, 1985
Lynette Barnes aged 39 was an exit student in 1985 who previously lived in Bendigo. She was previously secretary to the superintendent psychiatrist at the Bendigo Psychiatric Centre.B&W photograph head and shoulders."C&N 18/12/1985 S/S Lyn Barnes xit student"lynette barnes -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Dr. G. Scott, 1986
Dr. George Scott was born in Scotland in 1933 and taught at the University of Otago before becoming Reader in Botany at Monash University. He was appointed Master at Queens College at the University of Melbourne from 1986 - 1992. He died in 1998.B&W head and shoulders photograph."Dr. G. Scott C&N 26/2/1986"scott, george, dr., queens college -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Chairperson of NGAFG Joan Stott
Joan Stott was one time State President of the UCAF.B&W head and shoulders photograph."Chairperson of NGAFG Joan Stott"stott, joan -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Rev. GA Judkins President of the Conference 1937, 1937
Reverend George Alfred Judkins was born in 1871 and died at Springvale in 1958. He commenced his ministry in 1897. He was stationed at Mt Lyell 1897, Melbourne Richmond 1899, Yarram Yarram 1891, Bendigo 1904, Echuca 1908, Horsham 1911, Ballarat Barkly Street 1914, Malvern 1918, Canterbury 1922, Social Service Department Director 1925-1938, Box Hill 1939. He was Secretary-General of Conference in 1936 and President 1937. He was chaplain at Epworth Hospital from 1940 to 1949.B&W head and shoulders photograph. -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Undated
David Harris Prest (1931 - 2018) was brought up in Crystalbrook South Australia. He attended Prince Alfred College and was a resident at Lincoln Methodist College, taught in schools in South Australia, New South Wales and Cambridge United Kingdom before becoming head of Scotch College in Perth. He was Principal of Wesley College Melbourne 1972 - 1991. Head and shoulders photograph of David PrestPrest D.H.prest, david, wesley college -
Stawell Historical Society Inc
Photograph, Stawell High School Student Pamela Guy 1975
6975-37 Pamela Guy Femal Student inUniform Head and ShouldersPamela Guyeducation -
Ringwood RSL Sub-Branch
Equipment, Water Bottle, C WW2
Pattern 37 in webb shoulder carrier, -
Ringwood RSL Sub-Branch
Badges Australian Army, Major's cloth shoulder epaulette
Cloth shoulder epaulette with Crown embroidery -
Running Rabbits Military Museum operated by the Upwey Belgrave RSL Sub Branch
Shoulder Titles
Shoulder titles for tunic "AUSTRALIA' (2)badge/buttons, ww1, army -
Running Rabbits Military Museum operated by the Upwey Belgrave RSL Sub Branch
Shoulder Tab
Shoulder badge - cloth - Royal Artillerybadge/buttons, army -
Ringwood RSL Sub-Branch
Uniform - Velcro rank shoulder boards merchant navy
cloth shoulder pads, Merchant Navy -
Ringwood RSL Sub-Branch
Uniform - MN Shoulder Boards
Cloth merchant navy shoulder pads -
City of Kingston
Photograph - Digital image, Sepia
Black and white image of Norman McSwain (1838-1908), Councillor of Shire of Moorabbin 1882-1893. Norman was born in Skye Scotland and arrived in Australia with his parents Ewen and Margaret (nee McLeod) McSwain & five brothers & sisters on the 'Miltiades'. He married Margaret Mary Macdonald, daughter of Isabella and Alexander McDonald, and later in their marriage, they moved to Western Australia.Head and shoulders portrait of Norman McSwain. -
Bendigo Military Museum
Accessory - BADGES, "AUSTRALIA", c. 1939 - 44
Items issued to John Raymond Bruns VX88627, refer Cat No 5592 for his service history..1) .2) Australia shoulder badges brass curved shape attached to cloth kahki colour to fit over shoulder button down. .3) .4) Australia shoulder badges brass curved shape with clip through on the rear.accessory, australia badges, 2nd 38th -
Trafalgar Holden Museum
Functional object - Ammunition pouch
Military pouch worn either around waist or over shoulderAs manufactured by and distributed by GMHArmy green cotton webbing pouch for carrying ammunition. Fold over lid with brass stud fastening. Rear has links for fastening to belts.GMH 1943 DoD,military, pouch -
Running Rabbits Military Museum operated by the Upwey Belgrave RSL Sub Branch
Jacket - Mess
Jacket mess RAANC lapel badges (2) Sergeant stripes, Australia shoulder titles, Austarlian Army shoulder badge (part of UC006)uniform, 2010, army -
Bendigo Historical Society Inc.
Photograph - HARRIS COLLECTION: FEMALE PHOTO, Nineteenth Century
Head & Shoulders Young woman. Buttoned dress with ruffled shoulders. Bar brooch at neck. Growelle 69 & 71 Swanston Street Melbourne.Growelle 69 & 71 Swanston St Melbourne.photograph, person, female -
National Vietnam Veterans Museum (NVVM)
Uniform - Uniform, Army, Dinner Jacket
White dinner jacket - Officers - short epaulettes on shoulders. Decorative piece on ends of sleeves. Long lanpels. Rust marks on back of shouldersclothing -
Ballarat RSL Sub-Branch Inc.
Battle Dress, Jacket
Jacket with Captains rank, 2x Royal australian Infrantry shoulders flashes, 2X cloths shoulder patches lion on red & blue background.uniforms, ballarat rsl, ballarat -
Federation University Historical Collection
Costume, Paterson Powell Pty Ltd, Ballarat Teachers' College Blazer, 1948
This blazer was worn by John Freckleton at the Ballarat Teachers College in 1949. The Ballarat Teachers' College was established after the Victorian State Government and the State Education Department decided to establish two provincial teachers' colleges, at Ballarat and Bendigo. On 04 May 1926 W.H. Ellwood (Principal), Miss A. Bouchier, and Mr A.B. Jones, welcomed the first enrolment of 61 students to undertake the one year course. In 1927 the College moved to the former Ballarat East Town Hall in Barkly Street, which was remodelled for their use. It closed in December 1931 due to the Great Depression. In 1946 Ballarat Teachers' College reopened and relocated to the Dana Street State School. It was originally planned to open as a women's college, for whom the residence at 130 Victoria Street was purchased, but the decision was made to admit resident men from Ballarat. Mr T.W. Turner was appointed as Principal in 1951 and directed the introduction of a two year course for the Trained Primary Teachers' Certificate. The former one year course was terminated at the end of 1951. In 1958 the College was relocated to a custom built facility at Gillies Street, in close proximity to the Ballarat Botanical Gardens. Numbers increased with the introduction of the Trained Infant Teachers' Certificate course under the guidance of Mary Egan. With the introduction of a three year Diploma Course in 1968 accommodation became cramped. The introduction of the Diploma of Teaching (Primary) led to the Trained Infant Teachers' Certificate being discontinued in 1969, and the end of the Trained Primary Teachers' Certificate in 1969. Secondary Art and Craft students began studies at Ballarat Teachers' College in 1969 under Mr Ted Doney. In 1971 Mr D. Watson was appointed Principal. The State College of Victoria was proclaimed by Order in Council on 24 July 1973, and Ballarat Teachers' College became a constituent college of the State College of Victoria, and was known as State College of Victoria, Ballarat. By 1975 the College moved to Mount Helen as part of the Ballarat College of Advanced Education. Pre service teachers currently undertake their studies on the Mount Helen Campus of Federation University. ("Ruffians Attempted to Carry of the School Tent: A History of State Education in Ballarat", 1974, p73-4.)This unlined, 3 buttoned, royal blue woolen blazer is bound with twill tape in a matching colour. It has a patch pocket on either side near the bottom hem line and a breast patch pocket with an embroidered emblem of the Ballarat Teachers College. Under this emblem is embroidered in stem stitch 'B B' in brown and yellow. The pockets are all bound at the top and the sleeves have a trim binding about 8.5 cm from the cuff. The inside seams are all bound.The fabric label says - Paterson, Powell Pty Ltd Ballarat Attached to the shoulder seam is a tape with a handwritten - Georgeballarat teachers' college, blazer, costume, textiles, uniform, embroidery -
Merbein District Historical Society
Functional object - School Bag
Original Merbein High School vinyl bag with zip and shoulder strapLarge grey bag with handle, zip opening on the top and insignia of schoolMerbein / M.H.S on insigniahigh school, school bag, merbein high school, education, mhs