Showing 5101 items
matching 6th/8th
-
Warrnambool and District Historical Society Inc.
Book, Common prayer, 1920s
This book was given to Bill Rogers for his 8th birthday in 1927. Arthur George (Bill) was the grandson of Joseph Rogers, a Warrnambool plumber, and the son of Arthur and Agnes Rogers. Bill Rogers (d. 1995) worked in the advertising department of the Warrnambool Standard for nearly 50 years. He married Lorna Steller and they lived in MacDonald Street in South Warrnambool. This book is of interest as it belonged to Bill Rogers, a Warrnambool resident in the 20th century. It is also of interest as an example of the type of present given to an 8 year-old boy in the 1920s. This is a black leather covered book of 208 pages. There are two sections – The Book of Common Prayer and Hymns Ancient and Modern. The cover is partly detached from the binding and there is gold lettering on the front cover and spine. The pages are gilt-edged. There is a full page black and white illustration at the beginning of the text. The two inscriptions are handwritten in black ink. ‘To Billie on his 8th birthday 1927’ ‘Billie Rogers 32 McDonald St. Sth. Warrnambool’ bill rogers warrnambool, lorna steller warrnmbool, history of warrnambool -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph - McGeoch, Wilesmith, Attree, Grossman
The 8th Light Horse (Indi) was raised following World War One the Citizen Military Forces, superseding 16th (Indi) Light Horse. It had its headquarters at Benalla with sub-units throughout the Upper Murray and Northeast Victoria. In December 1941, the regiment converted from horse to mechanised, initially as 8th Reconnaissance Battalion then in July 1942 it became 8th Cavalry Regiment and served in Northern Territory. As Japanese threat to the mainland declined the regiment was disbanded.Black and white photograph mounted on card of four light horse officers: Lieutenant AH McGeoch 4 Troop A squadron (Wodonga), Lieutenant F. Attree, A Squadron, Lieutenant Wilesmith, 3 Troop A Squadron (Corryong) and seated Captain Grossman 2i/c C Squadron 8th Light Horse, c. 1938.wilesmith, attree, grossman, light horse, mcgeoch, wodonga, corryong, 8th -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph
‘A’ Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles conducted an annual range day at Puckapunyal at which soldiers undertook instruction leading to qualification in a range of weapons including M26 Grenade, 84mm Carl Gustav Medium Antitank Weapon (MAW) and both .30 calibre and .50 calibre machine guns.Colour photograph of Sergeant G Wynd, 'A' Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles, preparing to fire the 84mm Carl Gustav Medium Antitank Weapon during training at Puckapunyal. -
Bendigo Military Museum
Photograph - PHOTOGRAPH, FRAMED WW1, Post 1916
The photo has H. R. ROACH when it is actually R. H. ROACH. Robert Hartley ROACH enlisted on 28.1.1916 in the AIF in 17th reinforcements to the 6th Batt age 24 years 9 months. Embarked for Egypt 4.4.1916, embarked for England 31.5.1916, embarked for France 16.9.1916.hospitalised 4.12.1916 with Influenza, WIA Belgium 16.9.1917 GSW, to buttocks which penetrated through to the abdomen. Admitted to No 3 Canadian Casualty Clearing Station same day but DOW’s same day. His name is on the Honour Roll at the Soldiers Memorial Institute Bendigo. ‘Sepia photo on white background, mounted on grey cardboard fawn backing. Head & shoulders portrait of a solder without head gear, two Rising Sun badges on jacket collar. On backing LHS: "6TH BATT" On backing bottom centre: "PTE H R ROACH"photography-photographs/mounting accessories, 6th -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph, 1950 circa
The 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles was raised as a regiment of the Royal Australian Armoured Corps on 1 May 1948 with Headquarters in Melbourne and squadrons in Sale, Benalla/Wangaratta and Albury. In 1955 Regimental Headquarters moved to Wangaratta and a second squadron was located at Albury. The Sale squadron transferred to 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse. In 1977 8/13 VMR Regiment was reduced to an independent squadron A Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles and in 1991 was linked with 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse forming the VMR Squadron of that regiment. Alan Cunningham joined the regiment as a trooper in 1948 and went on to command the regiment as a Lieutenant Colonel 1962-65. The use of civilian vehicles was not uncommon inn early days of the regiment especially for activities such as radio training.Unique collection of photographs showing the first years of an armoured regiment of the post-Second World War era Citizen Military Forces showing equipment, uniforms, training and social activity and some personalities.Black and white photograph of T-model Ford utility vehicle and two soldiers. One of a collection of photographs of 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regiment between 1948 and 1951." Alan Cunningham's Staff Car - Ron Braddy Bonnet, Alan Cunningham Driver"8th/13th victorian mounted rifles, cunningham alan lieutenant ciolonel, braddy ronald -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Document - Letters, 1914-1918
No. 105 Trooper John Matthew McGlade, born Belfast, Northern Ireland, was a 30 year-old architect .iving in East Gippsland when he enlisted in 8th Light Horse 24th September 1914. He served at Gallipoli; was wounded at the Nek : later seved in Palestine : wounded at Gaza 1917. World War Two service in 12th Garrison Battalion VDC. Died of Jaundice 2 March 1943.Collection of letters written by Trooper J McGlade, 8th Light Horse Regiment during World War One (1914-1918). Transcribed but transcriber unknown.military, letter, wwi, world war one, mcglade -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph - 8/13 early days
The 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles was raised as a regiment of the Royal Australian Armoured Corps on 1 May 1948 with Headquarters in Melbourne and squadrons in Sale, Benalla/Wangaratta and Albury. In 1955 Regimental Headquarters moved to Wangaratta and a second squadron was located at Albury. The Sale squadron transferred to 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse. In 1977 8/13 VMR Regiment was reduced to an independent squadron A Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles and in 1991 was linked with 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse forming the VMR Squadron of that regiment.Unique collection of photographs showing the first years of an armoured regiment of the post-Second World War era Citizen Military Forces showing equipment, uniforms, training and social activity and some personalities.Black and white photograph of 13 soldiers standing in front of truck. They are in khaki drill uniform, boots, web anklets, belts and berets.One of a collection of photographs of 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regiment between 1948 and 1951." D/S Conversion Course, Albury. 1. Doug Gibbs, 2. Tom Giles, 3. Ernie Grant, 4. Ian McKay, 5. Alan Vietch, 6. Ken Kotthoff, 7. Captain Reg McDermottvmr, uniform, training, mcdermott, mckie -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph
The 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles was raised as a regiment of the Royal Australian Armoured Corps on 1 May 1948 with Headquarters in Melbourne and squadrons in Sale, Benalla/Wangaratta and Albury. In 1955 Regimental Headquarters moved to Wangaratta and a second squadron was located at Albury. The Sale squadron transferred to 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse. In 1977 8/13 VMR Regiment was reduced to an independent squadron A Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles and in 1991 was linked with 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse forming the VMR Squadron of that regiment.Unique collection of photographs showing the first years of an armoured regiment of the post-Second World War era Citizen Military Forces showing equipment, uniforms, training and social activity and some personalities.Black and white photograph of group of nine servicemen in variety of uniforms - Army, Navy and Air Force at Albury Drill Hall. One of a collection of photographs of 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regiment between 1948 and 1951.Anzac Day Colour Party Sentries, Bill Purcell, Ken Kothoff ( RAN ), John Larkin ( RAAF ), John Neale, Alan Cunningham, Ian McKay, Alan Veitch, Tom Giles, Maurie Davis. -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph
The 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles was raised as a regiment of the Royal Australian Armoured Corps on 1 May 1948 with Headquarters in Melbourne and squadrons in Sale, Benalla/Wangaratta and Albury. In 1955 Regimental Headquarters moved to Wangaratta and a second squadron was located at Albury. The Sale squadron transferred to 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse. In 1977 8/13 VMR Regiment was reduced to an independent squadron A Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles and in 1991 was linked with 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse forming the VMR Squadron of that regiment.Unique collection of photographs showing the first years of an armoured regiment of the post-Second World War era Citizen Military Forces showing equipment, uniforms, training and social activity and some personalities.Black and white photograph of soldier in service dress uniform, boots, web anklets, belt and shoulder straps, slouch hat, .303 rifle.One of a collection of photographs of 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regiment between 1948 and 1951." Anzac Day duties. Sgt. Bill Purcell. "military, vmr, cmf, uniform, anzac day -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph
The 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles was raised as a regiment of the Royal Australian Armoured Corps on 1 May 1948 with Headquarters in Melbourne and squadrons in Sale, Benalla/Wangaratta and Albury. In 1955 Regimental Headquarters moved to Wangaratta and a second squadron was located at Albury. The Sale squadron transferred to 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse. In 1977 8/13 VMR Regiment was reduced to an independent squadron A Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles and in 1991 was linked with 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse forming the VMR Squadron of that regiment.Unique collection of photographs showing the first years of an armoured regiment of the post-Second World War era Citizen Military Forces showing equipment, uniforms, training and social activity and some personalities.Black anf white photograph of soldier sitting on a General Grant tank, wearing khaki drill uniform, boots, web anklets and beret.One of a collection of photographs of 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regiment between 1948 and 1951." Alan Cunningham. " -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph
The 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles was raised as a regiment of the Royal Australian Armoured Corps on 1 May 1948 with Headquarters in Melbourne and squadrons in Sale, Benalla/Wangaratta and Albury. In 1955 Regimental Headquarters moved to Wangaratta and a second squadron was located at Albury. The Sale squadron transferred to 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse. In 1977 8/13 VMR Regiment was reduced to an independent squadron A Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles and in 1991 was linked with 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse forming the VMR Squadron of that regiment.Unique collection of photographs showing the first years of an armoured regiment of the post-Second World War era Citizen Military Forces showing equipment, uniforms, training and social activity and some personalities.Black and white photograph of soldier holding towel and standing beside White Scout Car, Beret is tucked under epaulet of shirt. One of a collection of photographs of 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regiment between 1948 and 1951." Tpr. V. Martin" -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph - 8th LH outpost, 1918 circa
The 8th Light Horse Regiment was engaged in the battle to capture Turkish defences at Tel El Khuweifle 16 Kilometres north of Beersheba from 1 to 6 November 1917. Other units were drawn from Imperial Camel Corps, British Yeomanry Division, New Zealand Mounted Rifles and 53 Welsh Division. The 8th Light Horse Regiment AIF was raised at Broadmeadows Victoria in September 1914 under the command of Lieutenant Colonel Alexander White and formed part of the 3rd Light Horse Brigade. The regiment served at Gallipoli where in a courageous but ill-fated charge at the Nek on 7 August 1915 it suffered horrendous casualties including Lieutenant Colonel White. Rebuilt in Egypt under the command of Lieutenant Colonel Leslie Maygar VC the regiment went on the serve throughout the Middle East Campaign. Colonel Maygar died of wounds at Beersheba when the regiment was attacked by enemy aircraft while waiting to follow up the successful charge of the 4th LH Brigade on 30 October 1917. The 8th Light Horse AIF was disbanded in 1919, but soon after re-raised as the 8th (Indi) Light Horse in the Citizen Military Forces, superseding 16th (Indi) Light Horse.Part of a rare collection of photographs of 8th Light Horse Regiment AIF during WWI (1914-1918).Black and white photograph of two soldiers of the 8th Light Horse Regiment AIF wearing slouch hats and armed with rifles. They are near three figures wearing helmets lying on the ground, possibly men of the Imperial Camel Corps or British infantry. Below photograph "Stony desert landscape known as Khuweilfe ( Thirsty Ridge ), 8 miles north of Beersheba. Only had a little water hence the name",tel el khuweifle, 8th, light horse, world war one, wwi -
Frankston RSL Sub Branch
Matchbox Cover, 1946; Post WW2
Rectangular stainless steel matchbox cover, with matches. It is engraved on its three sides. It was presented to W.H. Dolamore, VX7638 who was a P.O.W. in Changi, Malaya. He was with 8th Division, 2/10th Royal Australian Engineers, Australian Infantry Forces.On the front is an etching of a scroll with the inscription 8th Div, 2/10F, W.H.DOLAMORE VX 27638, RAE, AIF. onthe back is the Rotary International symbol and on the side are the words P.O.W. CHANGI MALAYA.8th, aif, changi, w h, cover, matchbox, dolamore, p o w, division, 2 10th, rae -
Vision Australia
Education kit - Object, A. Francke, Stereoscopic charts for squinters [by] Dr. Emil Hegg
A set of 70 (incomplete as full set believed to be 85 cards) black and white and colour stereoscopic charts, divided into series Includes geometric, pictorial and photographic examples of charts and Schlechteres Auge test. An instructional leaflet is also included. These featured images thought to strengthen the eye muscles.1 rectangular fawn cardboard box sleeve which contains specially printed cards with pictures and text6th editionequipment, emil hegg -
Running Rabbits Military Museum operated by the Upwey Belgrave RSL Sub Branch
Plaque D Co. 6th RAR
D Company 6th Battalion RARplaque, current, army -
Whitehorse Historical Society Inc.
Book, Sixth Progressive Primer
Childrens book - 6th Progressive Primer.Merrilyn Vasti - Parklandsbooks, children's -
The 5th/6th Battalion Royal Victoria Regiment Historical Collection
Photograph - Photograph of soldiers of 2/6th Battalion on exercise in 1943
A photograph 2/6th Battalion soldiers on exercise. The explanation text stating "A Bren carrier from the 2/6th Battalion comes ashore during beach landing exercises at point Walter, Western Australia, 6th February 1943." -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph - 8/13 farewell parade 1976
In 1977 the 8th/13th VMR was reduced to Independent status titled ' A Squadron 8/13 VMR". A farewell parade was held at Buna Barracks Albury This is one of a collection of photographs found at the Cobram Tip. They were handed to local Member Tim McCurdy MLA who handed them on to former 8/13th Sergeant Adrian Younger who in turn placed them in the Regimental Collection,Black and white photograph showing 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regiment marching past saluting dais at Buna Barracks Albury during Farewell Parade 1976.albury, parade, buna barracks, cobram, mccurdy, younger -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph - Staghound
The 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles was raised as a regiment of the Royal Australian Armoured Corps on 1 May 1948 with Headquarters in Melbourne and squadrons in Sale, Benalla/Wangaratta and Albury. In 1955 Regimental Headquarters moved to Wangaratta and a second squadron was located at Albury. The Sale squadron transferred to 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse. In 1977 8/13 VMR Regiment was reduced to an independent squadron A Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles and in 1991 was linked with 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse forming the VMR Squadron of that regiment.Unique collection of photographs showing the first years of an armoured regiment of the post-Second World War era Citizen Military Forces showing equipment, uniforms, training and social activity and some personalities.Black and white photograph of Staghound Armoured Car bogged on side of road. Vehicle markings indicate negative has been printer in reverse. One of a collection of photographs of 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regiment between 1948 and 1951." Staghound bogged "cmf, vmr, staghound, training -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph - Lynx & White at Buna Barracks
The 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles was raised as a regiment of the Royal Australian Armoured Corps on 1 May 1948 with Headquarters in Melbourne and squadrons in Sale, Benalla/Wangaratta and Albury. In 1955 Regimental Headquarters moved to Wangaratta and a second squadron was located at Albury. The Sale squadron transferred to 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse. In 1977 8/13 VMR Regiment was reduced to an independent squadron A Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles and in 1991 was linked with 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse forming the VMR Squadron of that regiment.The 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles was raised as a regiment of the Royal Australian Armoured Corps on 1 May 1948 with Headquarters in Melbourne and squadrons in Sale, Benalla/Wangaratta and Albury. In 1955 Regimental Headquarters moved to Wangaratta and a second squadron was located at Albury. The Sale squadron transferred to 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse. In 1977 8/13 VMR Regiment was reduced to an independent squadron A Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles and in 1991 was linked with 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse forming the VMR Squadron of that regiment.Black and white photograph of a Lynx (Doodle Bug) Scout Car and White Armoured Personnel Carrier at Puckapunyal. Crewmen in service dress uniform and berets.One of a collection of photographs of 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regiment between 1948 and 1951." A Squadron at Puckapunyal Camp 1950. "puckapunyal, dingo scout car, white scout car -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph - George Atkinson and Alan Cunningham
The 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles was raised as a regiment of the Royal Australian Armoured Corps on 1 May 1948 with Headquarters in Melbourne and squadrons in Sale, Benalla/Wangaratta and Albury. In 1955 Regimental Headquarters moved to Wangaratta and a second squadron was located at Albury. The Sale squadron transferred to 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse. In 1977 8/13 VMR Regiment was reduced to an independent squadron A Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles and in 1991 was linked with 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse forming the VMR Squadron of that regiment.Unique collection of photographs showing the first years of an armoured regiment of the post-Second World War era Citizen Military Forces showing equipment, uniforms, training and social activity and some personalities.Black and white photograph of two soldiers wearing drill uniforms , boots, web anklets, belt and berets standing beside a Staghound Armoured Car.One of a collection of photographs of 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regiment between 1948 and 1951." George Atkinson and Alan Cunninghamatkinson, cunningham, 8/13 vmr, staghound -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph
The 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles was raised as a regiment of the Royal Australian Armoured Corps on 1 May 1948 with Headquarters in Melbourne and squadrons in Sale, Benalla/Wangaratta and Albury. In 1955 Regimental Headquarters moved to Wangaratta and a second squadron was located at Albury. The Sale squadron transferred to 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse. In 1977 8/13 VMR Regiment was reduced to an independent squadron A Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles and in 1991 was linked with 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse forming the VMR Squadron of that regiment.Unique collection of photographs showing the first years of an armoured regiment of the post-Second World War era Citizen Military Forces showing equipment, uniforms, training and social activity and some personalities.Black and white photograph of a soldier with rifle. Wearing khaki drill shirt and trousers, boots, web ankllets, belt and shoulder straps and beret. One of a collection of photographs of 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regiment between 1948 and 1951." Norm Leischke ( Later Lt. ) -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph - soldier and AFV
Victorian Mounted Rifles was raised as a regiment of the Royal Australian Armoured Corps on 1 May 1948 with Headquarters in Melbourne and squadrons in Sale, Benalla/Wangaratta and Albury. In 1955 Regimental Headquarters moved to Wangaratta and a second squadron was located at Albury. The Sale squadron transferred to 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse. In 1977 8/13 VMR Regiment was reduced to an independent squadron A Squadron 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles and in 1991 was linked with 4th/19th Prince of Wales’s Light Horse forming the VMR Squadron of that regiment.The 8th/13th Unique collection of photographs showing the first years of an armoured regiment of the post-Second World War era Citizen Military Forces showing equipment, uniforms, training and social activity and some personalities.Black and White photograph of soldier standing beside Staghound Armoured Car, wearing long sleeved khaki drill jackrt and trousers.beret and cravat. One of a collection of photographs of 8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regiment between 1948 and 1951." Tpr. Keith Neale "military, uniform, vmr, citizen soldier, staghound, armour, vehicle -
Bendigo Military Museum
Letter - SYMPATHY LETTER and ENVELOPE, 1) 27.11.1917. .2) 2.12.1917
The letter is to Mr J Pierce from Chaplain Carter 6th BTN AIF with sympathy for the loss of his son George Frederick Pierce DCM. Refer Cat No 1891P for his service details, award and death..1) Letter on graph paper written by hand in blue ink. .2) “OHMS” envelope, yellowed and stamped in red, “passed by sensor”.1) “In the field 27.11.17”, “George W Carter Chaplain 6th BTN AIF”. .2) “Mr Pierce Sebastian Post Office Via Bendigo Victoria Australia”sympathy, letters, military -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph - 8th LH Gallipoli
The 8th Light Horse Regiment AIF was raised at Broadmeadows Victoria in September 1914 under the command of Lieutenant Colonel Alexander White and formed part of the 3rd Light Horse Brigade. The regiment served at Gallipoli where in a courageous but ill-fated charge at the Nek on 7 August 1915 it suffered horrendous casualties including Lieutenant Colonel White. Faded black and white photograph of two 8th Light Horse soldiers standing beside sleeping dugout in side of sandbagged trench at Gallipoli, 1915. Photo is glued to fluted plastic backing.world war one, wwi, gallipoli, anzac, 8th, light horse -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph - 8th LH Gallipoli
The 8th Light Horse Regiment AIF was raised at Broadmeadows Victoria in September 1914 under the command of Lieutenant Colonel Alexander White and formed part of the 3rd Light Horse Brigade. The regiment served at Gallipoli where in a courageous but ill-fated charge at the Nek on 7 August 1915 it suffered horrendous casualties including Lieutenant Colonel White. Faded black and white photograph of 8th Light Horse soldiers preparing to dis-embark from warship to land at Anzac Cove, May 1915. Photo is glued to fluted plastic backing.world war one, wwi, gallipoli, anzac, 8th, light horse -
8th/13th Victorian Mounted Rifles Regimental Collection
Photograph - 8th LH Gallipoli
The 8th Light Horse Regiment AIF was raised at Broadmeadows Victoria in September 1914 under the command of Lieutenant Colonel Alexander White and formed part of the 3rd Light Horse Brigade. The regiment served at Gallipoli where in a courageous but ill-fated charge at the Nek on 7 August 1915 it suffered horrendous casualties including Lieutenant Colonel White. Faded black and white photograph of 8th Light Horse soldiers wearing shorts putting on his boot outside dugout in trench at Gallipoli, 1915. Photo is glued to fluted plastic backing.world war one, wwi, gallipoli, anzac, 8th, light horse -
RSL Victoria - Anzac House Reference Library and Memorabilia Collection
Letter of Edwin Charles Waldegrate Lloyd, Edwin Charles Lloyd, 12/7/1917
Letter of thanks to "Miss Elsie" by Lloyd, for his having received the pair of sox she knitted. Lloyd enclosed some Turkish (paper) money got from a captured Turkish cavalryman.Two page handwritten letter of Edwin Lloyd (1067 - 6th Light Horse Regiment, 6th Reinforcement), dated 12th July 1917.ww1, letters, 6 light horse, edwin charles waldegrate -
Northern District School of Nursing. Managed by Bendigo Historical Society Inc.
Photograph - P.T.S. Training School 65, 1965
The Northern District School of Nursing opened in 1950 to address the issues around nurse recruitment, training and education that had previously been hospital based. The residential school was to provide theoretical and in-house education and practical training over three years. The students would also receive practical hands-on training in the wards of associated hospitals. The Northern District School of Nursing operated from Lister House, Rowan Street, Bendigo. It was the first independent school of nursing in Victoria and continued until it closed in 1989.School 65 commenced Jan 1965 38 Female Nurses are in uniform. Three rows, the front row seated and the second and third row standing. Some names are written on the rear of the photo, but not all. Back Row: Nurse 6th from the right is Sue Schron (Mildura) Middle Row: 6th from the left is Sue Greenham, 8th from the left Noelene Lockett Front row: 5th from the left is Cyntia Waters Photo by L.A. Hughes, 15 High Street Eaglehawk.nurse training, ndsn, lister house, school 65 -
Tarnagulla History Archive
Death Certificate, 1872
A large lot of papers, including this and many other birth, death and burial records, were apparently found in the ceiling cavity of the Sandy Creek/Tarnagulla Post and Telegraph Office in the later 20th Century, during building works. Donald Clark Collection. Transcript of document (partly printed, partly handwritten): TO THE REGISTRAR OF THE DISTRICT IN WHICH THE UNDERMENTIONED DEATH TOOK PLACE I hereby certify that I attended John Coombe aged 26 last Birthday; that I last saw him on April 6th 1872 that he died on April 6th at Llanelly and that the cause of his death was Typhoid Fever, Duration of illness 21 days. Signed: Edward Green Proff. Title: [indecipherable] Address: Tarnagulla Date: April 8th 1872