Showing 6092 items
matching religion-methodist-ministers
-
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Bible
Embossed black leather covered bible with gold leaf writing on front cover and spine. Has handwriting on endpaper. Gilt edged pages.Cover: In Memory of William Henry Greene 1871-1961" Endpaper: "Presented by his family and members of this church in loving memory of the late William Henry Green former Methodist Home Missionary and lay preacher 1871-1961. Dedicated Rev T.F.Freeman at Toorak 17/12/61".freeman, t.f., rev, green, william henry, methodist home missionary -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Undated c.1949
Rev. Kolinio Saukuru was the grandson of the only survivor of the party led by Rev. Thomas Baker, which was massacred and eaten by a hill tribe in central Fiji in 1867. In 1933 he was appointed by the Methodist Mission as a catechist to work among the aborigines of North Australia. He was accepted for the ministry in 1939, and was ordained at Croker Island in 1945. During WWII he was in charge of the Yirrkala Mission Station. B & W head and shoulders studio portrait of the Rev. Kolinio Saukuru, in postcard format.Rev. Kolinio Saukurukolinio saukuru, methodist, minister, thomas baker, fiji, croker island, aboriginies, mission -
Whitehorse Historical Society Inc.
Photograph, Municipal Chambers - Shire of Blackburn & Mitcham - First Office
When the Shire of Blackburn and Mitcham was proclaimed on 27th May 1925, the second meeting of the Shire was held in the hall of the Methodist Church on Monday 28th September 1925 at 7.30pm.|Three ensuing meetings were also held there and following meetings were at the dwelling in Whitehorse Road, which was purchased by the Shire for use as their office. (By Coincidence this dwelling was almost on the site of their new Municipal Offices.)Black and white picture - Municipal Chambers of Shire of Blackburn & Mitcham located opposite the present offices of City of Whitehorse in Whitehorse Road, Nunawading|See also NP35 & NP36 after it was destroyed by fire.municipal chambers - first office, shire of blackburn and mitcham, whitehorse road, nunawading, methodist church -
Bendigo Historical Society Inc.
Document - Long Gully Uniting Church - Cornish Heritage Order of Service 25 March 1990, 23/02/1986
The initial Methodist Church at Long Gully was a slab hut and in 1855 the first brick building was erected. This was replaced in 1865 by a brick church designed by architects Vahland and Getzschmann. In 1877 the present church, designed by the same architects was built, with the 1865 building becoming the Sunday school. A large part of the congregation was Cornish miners of whom there were large numbers in Long Gully and California Gully.A4 Sheet printed both sides of page, sketch of Long Gully Uniting Church on the front cover.religion, lydia chancellor collection, history, church -
Surrey Hills Historical Society Collection
Photograph, Surrey Hills Wesleyan Sunday School teachers, Before 1888
Donor identification was that man in back row on left was Henry Beckett; 2nd from left was Emma Beckett, later Mrs John Gray. The Beckett family were important in the establishment of the Wesleyan / Methodist church in Surrey Hills and adjacent areas. Emma Beckett married John Gray in 1888 at 'Guildford Villa' in Essex Road, Surrey Hills which was the Beckett family home.B&W photo of a group of 15 women and 9 men standing and seated in front of a light-coloured weatherboard wall. surrey hills wesleyan sunday school, surrey hills wesleyan church, surrey hills methodist church, churches, (mr) henry beckett, (miss) emma beckett, (mrs) john gray, beckett family -
Bendigo Military Museum
Photograph - Minister for Defence’s Visit to the Army Survey Regiment, Fortuna, Bendigo, c1978
This collection of 16 photos was most likely taken in 1978. Mr Denis James “Jim” Killen was the Minister for Defence in the Fraser Government from 1975 to 1982. It’s evident in these photos he was taken on a tour through the production areas in Air Survey, Cartographic and Lithographic Squadrons. Jim Killen served in the RAAF in WW2 and later had an illustrious career in politics. After receiving his knighthood and an AC for service to Australia, he was known as Sir Denis James "Jim" Killen, AC, KCMG. Key Army Survey Regiment personnel identified include the CO LTCOL Bob Skitch, who led the unit from 1976 to 1980 and WO1 Aub Harvey, who was RSM from 1976 to 1982.This is a set of photographs of a visit to the Army Survey Regiment, Bendigo c1978, by Mr D.J Killen who was the Minister for Defence. The photographs were printed on photographic paper and are part of the Army Survey Regiment’s Collection. The photographs were scanned at 300 dpi. .1) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: Unidentified, Mr D.J. Killen and CO LTCOL Bob Skitch. .2) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: CO LTCOL Bob Skitch and Mr D.J. Killen. .3) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: Unidentified, SPR Mark Lander. .4) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: MAJ Peter Eddy, Mr D.J. Killen. .5) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: CPL Alan Staley, Mr D.J. Killen, MAJ Peter Eddy. .6) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: CPL Robert Cocksedge, Mr D.J. Killen, MAJ Peter Eddy, unidentified. .7) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: CPL Mick Davey, Mr D.J. Killen, MAJ Peter Eddy. .8) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: CPL Mick Davey, MAJ Peter Eddy, Mr D.J. Killen, CO LTCOL Bob Skitch. .9) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: Unidentified, Mr D.J. Killen. .10) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: Unidentified, Mr D.J. Killen. SGT Bob Scaddan. .11) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: Unidentified, Mr D.J. Killen, LCPL Laurel (Ryant) Staley. .12) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: CAPT Gary Kenney, Mr D.J. Killen. .13) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: CAPT Gary Kenney, Mr D.J. Killen, RSM Aub Harvey. .14) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: Unidentified, unidentified, Mr D.J. Killen, CAPT Gary Kenney, .15) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: CO LTCOL Bob Skitch, Mr D.J. Killen, CAPT Gary Kenney. .16) - Photo, black and white, c1978. L to R: Mr D.J. Killen, unidentified, CAPT Gary Kenney.royal australian survey corps, rasvy, army survey regiment, army svy regt, fortuna, asr -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Undated c.1864
Rev. Daniel James Draper (1810 - 1866). Born Wickham, Hampshire 28 August 1810. In 1830 joined the Methodist Society at Fareham and became a local preacher. Nominated in March 1834 as a candidate for the Wesleyan Methodist ministry. Appointed preacher on probation to the Charteris circuit. Married Sarah Webb in September 1835, ordained 7 October 1835, sailed for Australia on 13 October 1835. Served at Parramatta, where his wife died on 16 February 1838. Married Elizabeth Shelley (1808 - 1866) daughter of William Shelley, formerly a missionary in Tonga and Tahiti in July 1939. Served in N.S.W., Victoria and South Australia. Elected President of the 1859 Conference. Granted leave in 1865 to return to England as the Australian representative to the British Conference. He was returning to Australia on the SS London in January 1866 when he and his wife, along with 244 others, perished when their ship sank during a fierce storm in the Bay of Biscay.Sepia toned, full length carte de visite studio portrait of Rev Daniel J. Draper.daniel james draper, sarah webb, elizabeth shelley, ss london, bay of biscay, methodist, wesleyan, minister, president of conference, shipwreck -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Printed etching, 1859
Rev. Daniel James Draper (1810 - 1866). Born Wickham, Hampshire 28 August 1810. In 1830 joined the Methodist Society at Fareham and became a local preacher. Nominated in March 1834 as a candidate for the Wesleyan Methodist ministry. Appointed preacher on probation to the Charteris circuit. Married Sarah Webb in September 1835, ordained 7 October 1835, sailed for Australia on 13 October 1835. Served at Parramatta, where his wife died on 16 February 1838. Married Elizabeth Shelley (1808 - 1866) daughter of William Shelley, formerly a missionary in Tonga and Tahiti in July 1939. Served in N.S.W., Victoria and South Australia. Elected President of the 1859 Conference. Granted leave in 1865 to return to England as the Australian representative to the British Conference. He was returning to Australia on the SS London in January 1866 when he and his wife, along with 244 others, perished when their ship sank during a fierce storm in the Bay of Biscay.B & W waist length printed etching of the Rev. Daniel J. Draper"Revd. Daniel J. Draper. President of the Australasian Conference 1859."daniel james draper, sarah webb, elizabeth shelley, ss london, bay of biscay, methodist, wesleyan, minister, president of conference, shipwreck -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Newspaper cutting, 1866
Rev. Daniel James Draper (1810 - 1866). Born Wickham, Hampshire 28 August 1810. In 1830 joined the Methodist Society at Fareham and became a local preacher. Nominated in March 1834 as a candidate for the Wesleyan Methodist ministry. Appointed preacher on probation to the Charteris circuit. Married Sarah Webb in September 1835, ordained 7 October 1835, sailed for Australia on 13 October 1835. Served at Parramatta, where his wife died on 16 February 1838. Married Elizabeth Shelley (1808 - 1866) daughter of William Shelley, formerly a missionary in Tonga and Tahiti in July 1939. Served in N.S.W., Victoria and South Australia. Elected President of the 1859 Conference. Granted leave in 1865 to return to England as the Australian representative to the British Conference. He was returning to Australia on the SS London in January 1866 when he and his wife, along with 244 others, perished when their ship sank during a fierce storm in the Bay of Biscay.B & W etching: two head and shoulder portraits of Rev. Daniel Draper and Mrs Elizabeth Draper superimposed on a scene depicting the shipwreck of the S.S. London, with cross and crown above.daniel james draper, sarah webb, elizabeth shelley, ss london, bay of biscay, methodist, wesleyan, minister, president of conference, shipwreck -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, Undated, c. 1970s
Born on the West Coast of Tasmania. Became a teacher inTasmania in the early 1930. He married Emily Ferguson, a presbyterian girl, but felt a calling to the Methodist Church. John went to Underbool in Vic in 1939. Joined the RAAF in 1942 and trained as a Navigator for Bomber Command. Was recalled in 1943 and began his ministry in the Woomelang Circuit, then at Mitiamo 1947-1950; Port Fairy 1950-52; Nathalia 1952-54. He left the ministry and bought a small farm near Bendigo. After 18 mths he started preaching at Mckenzie Street Methodist church with the title Pastor. In 1958 he was recalled to the ministry and served at Morwell. He was also chaplain to Morwell River Prison, Newport West, Coburg, Milan Italy and Finally at Moonee Ponds where he retired in 1978. After retirement he did supply work in places such as Sea Lake, Heathcote, Warragul and Quirindi NSW. John died on 25 July 2000. B & W photograph of Rev. John Adamthwaite standing in front of an open briefcase.john adamthwaite, methodist, minister -
Bendigo Military Museum
Certificate - GREEK CERTIFICATE, Greek Govt, 12.2.1980
Text on rear, “Mainland Albania, Macedonia, Thraki - Crete - Greek democracy - Expedition memorable medal 1940 - 41 - We award - The participant of 1940 - 41 expedition - defend your Country, Athens 12.2.80, Minister for Defence Eyagelos - Averooh Jusitcha” Certificate awarded to John Eric Wiles VX16067, refer Cat No 5410P for his service details.Certificate, paper light yellow colour background, each side a column with top section over, under is a green leaf arrangement followed by Greek print, a centre name hand written in “Mr J. E. Wiles”, bottom stamped on LH side, RH side is dated. On rear a typed out and stuck is the English wording of the front also a typed piece re the recipient.On rear taped, “J. E. Wiles 2/7th INF”certificates, greece crete, wiles -
Uniting Church Archives - Synod of Victoria
Photograph, c. 1980s, possibly 1982 when Born was moderator
David Chisholm Organising Secretary of NCYC. Rev Dr Lewis Born was ordained in Qld 1953, minister at Caloundra 1952-1957;YPD 1957-1969, DCE 1970 TO 06/1985, Moderator 1982, then to Victoria as O/M Pastor Doncaster Church of Christ 07/85 to 1990, then at Redcliffe 10/1990 to 03/1995. Retired March 1995.B&W waist length photo of David Chisholm, shown holding a paper with Rev. Dr Lewis Born, who is wearing a jacket and tie. david chisholm; national christian youth convention (ncyc); rev. dr lewis born; caloundra; department of christian education; moderator; pastor of doncster church of christ; uniting church minister -
National Wool Museum
Book, 'Boss' Hurst of Geelong and Nauru: a life
"'Boss' Hurst of Geelong and Nauru: a life" - Don Chambers, 1994. Biography of Harold Hurst who was involved in the Scouting Movement in the Geelong and Western District area. He was also heavily involved in Nauru and its independence. He invented, patented and manufactured metal fasteners for wool bales and fencing. This book has been signed by the author and the then prime minister of Nauru.Don Chambers / 16 October 1994 Bernard Dowlyogo / 16.10.94wool bale clips, hurst, mr harold e. -
Unions Ballarat
In search of Billy Hughes, Horne, Donald, 1979
Biography of Billy Hughes from his early career to gaining the office of Prime Minister of Australia. He also served as an organiser for the Amalgamated Shearers' Union prior to embarking upon his political career. He belonged to five different political parties over his parliamentary career: Labor, National Labor, Nationalist, Australian, United Australia, to Liberal.Relevance to Australian political history. Pertinent to biography of Billy Hughes.Paper; book. Front cover: painting of Billy Hughes; blue lettering.Front cover: title and author's name.btlc, ballarat trades hall, ballarat trades and labour council, w. hughes, hughes, billy, prime minister, unions, amalgamated shearers' union, union organisers, politics, australian labor party, alp, national labor party, nationalist party, australian party, united australia party, liberal party australia, history, biography -
Lauriston Girls’ School (incorporating Lauriston Museum and Gallery)
Painting, Portrait of Miss Gladys Davies Headmistress 1956-1972
Painted by June Mendoza AO. An Old Lauistonian (1939), June painted this portrait in 1972. An globally acclaimed portrait artist, her works include Queen Elizabeth and other members of the royal family, Prime Ministers and a range of politicians, sports people, military officers and celebrities. This portrait is part of the Record Series 74. Permanent/Semi-Permanent Displayed Works.Oil Portrait of Miss Gladys Davies Headmistress Miss Gladys Davies Headmistress 1956-1972 -
Melbourne Legacy
Booklet, A Legatee at the Coronation. A letter written from London by Legatee S. G. Savige, 1953
Legatee Stan Savige attended the Coronation of Queen Elizabeth on 2nd June 1953 as a representative of Legacy at the request of the Co-ordinating Council and the Australian Prime Minister, Robert Menzies. This booklet is his account of the events as he wrote in a letter back the President of Legacy. In shows the interest in the Coronation, and L/- Savige's account was of interest to so many that it was published in a booklet for the Legatees.The Coronation of Queen Elizabeth II was an important event and Sir Stan Savige felt it worth sending a letter that was published for Legatees about it. Also that Legacy was deemed important enough to send a representative.A booklet recounting the Queen's Coronation as observed by Stan Savige.coronation, stan savige -
Ringwood and District Historical Society
Newspaper, Scrapbook Clipping, Library Collection, Ringwood, Victoria, `
``Newspaper clipping from "The Post", 15-9-93, P9 School quality provision taskforce recommendations for the Croydon/Ringwood district have been submitted to South East Metropolitan General Manager Steve Macpherson. District Liaison proncipal Geoff Haw said Mr Macpherson would consider the recommendations and pass the reports onto Education Minister Don Hayward.` -
Kew Historical Society Inc
Photograph, Centenary Celebrations, Willsmere [Kew] Mental Hospital, 1972, 1972
This photograph is part of a series taken at the Willsmere (Kew) Mental Hospital. The photographs were gifted to the Kew Historical Society in 2018 by Rosemary Barnes. The photos had been in the possession of her former husband, Dr Fred Stamp, the last medical superintendent of the hospital. In 2019, the photographs were transferred to the State Archives as Permanent Government Records, as the Society is only entitled as a Class-B Place of Deposit to hold Temporary Government Records. The Society was permitted to keep and publish a digital copy of each photograph. Many of the photographs include information on the reverse about individuals or locations. Where this is the case, these have been published here as images that can be viewed in the picture carousel. Permission for third parties to reproduce this record must be granted by the Public Record Office Victoria.One of a series of photographs of the centenary celebrations at the Willsmere Mental Hospital in 1972.THE PREMIER OF VICTORIA AT OFFICIAL CENTENARY GATHERING L-R MR JACK EVANS (DEPUTY CHAIRMAN), MR ROSSITER (REP MINISTER FOR HEALTH), HIS EXCELLENCY THE GOVERNOR OF VICTORIA, DR C.G. BURT (* SUPERINTENDENT), LADY ? IN WAITING, LADY DELACOMBE, MR WOODS M.H.A., DR STOLLER CHAIRMAN M.H.A.willsmere mental hospital, willsmere unit, kew mental hospital, kew lunatic asylum, willsmere hospital -
Wodonga & District Historical Society Inc
Photograph - Henry Beardmore - Wodonga Shire Councillor and Member for Benambra
Henry Beardmore was a significant contributor to Wodonga and the state of Victoria. He was born in Melton on 7th February 1863 to Edwin James Beardmore and Flora McDonald. He grew up in Benalla and became a butcher at Glenrowan before taking up land at Leneva near Wodonga, Victoria. On 15 July 1885 Henry married his first wife, Agnes Annie Lee and they had two sons and two daughters. Agnes died in 1892. In 23 August 1893, Henry married Jessie Muirhead and they had six sons and four daughters. Henry represented the Green Hills riding on Wodonga Shire Council from 1898 to 1922, including terms as President from 1900-01, 1903-4, 1908-10, 1911-12, 1914-17. In 1922 Mr. Beardmore retired from the Wodonga Council due to his increased workload in State politics. Henry Beardmore was a Freemason including Master of the Wodonga Lodge from 1906 to 1907, and was an active member up until his death. From 1905-1915, Henry Beardmore leased “De Kerilleau” homestead with the exception of 1907, when Mr W. Huon was in residence, and after he died there in 1907, the Beardmore family returned. Henry Beardmore won the seat of Benambra in the Victorian Legislative Assembly at a by-election on 20th April 1917. He continuously represented the Benambra electorate as a Nationalist and United Australia Party member for more than 15 years. He was a strong advocate for country development and decentralisation, but he declined to join the Country Party. He held the seat of Benambra, up to the date of his death, and was returned unopposed on four occasions. He was an Honorary Minister in 1924 and for a short time in 1929, Minister of Railways, Minister in-charge of Electrical Undertakings and Minister of Labour. He was a leading supporter of Kiewa Hydro-Electric Project and opponent of Yallourn coalfield. Henry Beardmore died in Wodonga on 29 August 1932. His last residence was on the corner Elm Street and Beechworth Road.This photo is significant because it depicts an important local and State politician and member of the Wodonga Community.A black and white formal portrait of Henry Beardmore.henry beardmore, wodonga council, benambra - victorian politics -
Bendigo Historical Society Inc.
Photograph - MINING AREA VIEW FROM NEW CHUM HILL, 1875
Black and white photograph. View overlooking mining area from New Chum Hill in the early 1870's showing four poppet legs and at least 9 chimneys (small chimneys and poppets at L distance). Golden Square Methodist Church C distance. Inscriptions: typed on front 'Looking South from New Chum Hill in early 1970's. The rich :Lazarus New Chum: in foreground. Other rich New Chum Mines in background'N J Caireplace, mining site, see also 2001.003.01 -
Eltham District Historical Society Inc
Document - Folder, Victoria Archaeological Survey, 1982-1990
sites, structures, archaeological significance, victoria archaeological survey -
Federation University Historical Collection
Photograph - Photograph - Black and White, Lamb Family of Ballarat, c1870s, c1870s
The Lamb family of Ballarat were associated with Lamb's Woollen Mill. Many members were educated at the Ballarat School of MinesTen photographs of the Lamb family, who were associated with Lamb's Woollen Mill, Ballarat. .1) Jessie Jane Davey/Bowey, c1870 .2) Jessie (Davey) Lamb, c1870 .3) Susannah (Westley) Lamb, c1873 .4) Susannah (Westley) Lamb, c1875 .5) 'Grandma Davey (probably mother of Jessie Lamb), c1870 .6) [?] Lamb, c1890 .7) Robert Lamb (minister), c1870 .8) Robert Lamb, c1865 .9) Tom Lamb .10) Edwin Lamb, c1875lamb, lamb's woollen mill, jessie lamb, susannah lamb, robert lamb, tom lamb, edwin lamb, charles lamb, women -
Federation University Historical Collection
Document - Invitiation, Invitiation and Programme for the opening of the Ballarat School of Mines Complex at 130 Victoria Street, Ballarat East, 1991, 28/06/1991
The opening of the Complex on 28 June 1991 marks a significant step in the capacity of the Ballarat School of Mines to provide quality, modern, purpose built and comfortable accommodation for student. Funding for the project came primarily from the sale of Ballarat School of Mines hostels owned by the Education Department in Webster Street which allowed the construction and refurbishment at 128-130 Webster Street to became an impressive complex.An invitation and programme on cream card with marron images and text. Each photo shows an image of 130 Victoria Street, Ballarat East. .1 & .2) Programme for the Official Opening of the Ballarat School of Mines Student Residential Complex at 130 Victoria Street by the Honourable Barry Pullen, M.L.C., minister for Education and training, on 28 June 1991. .3 7 .4) Invitation to attend the official opening of the Ballarat School of Mines Student Residential Complex at 130 Victoria Streetballarat school of mines student residential complex, ballarat school of mines, 130 victoria st, hostel, student residence, barry pullen, barker, jack barker, e.j. barker, terry moran, anne fennell -
Bendigo Historical Society Inc.
Document - LYDIA CHANCELLOR COLLECTION; ROLL OF HONOR MYER'S BENDIGO
Cream souvenir programme with a picture of 2 flags on the front and blue and red lines with gold lettering. The wording is ' Souvenir Programme - Unveiling of Honor (sic) Roll of the Employees of Myer's, Bendigo, who have joined the Australian Imperial Forces: By The Prime Minister, Rt. Hon. W. M. Hughes, P.C. at Myers Pall Mall, Bendigo. Tuesday July 31st, 1917.' Inside in gold lettering is an outline of a musical programme and the Roll of Honor itself with the names of 42 employees.event, official, civic, lydia chancellor, collection, event, war, soldiers, music, honor roll, program, programme, souvenir, myer's patriotic workers' society -
Bendigo Historical Society Inc.
Document - CENTRAL GOLDFIELDS RESTORATION FUND, March 1986
Pamphlet on the Central Goldfields Restoration Fund issued by the Victorian Ministry for Planning and Environment. Includes a map of the central goldfields region, introduction by Jim Kennan (Minister) and 3 photographs. Also a description on how the fund operates and how to apply for assistance. An insert of 2 blank application forms. Photos show , Miners using a sluice at Tarnagulla c.1880. Cnr of Sturt and Lydiard Sts, Ballarat c.1880. E. Eberhard Cordial Factory at Clunes c.1890.Victorian Ministry for Planning and Environmentorganization, government, central goldfields, restoration fund, ministry for planning and environment, j. kennan, tarnagulla, ballarat, clunes. -
NMIT (Northern Melbourne Institute of TAFE)
Photograph: CTS 1958 School Council with Minister for Education
Black and white photograph inside a photo manila folder taken by Allan Studios. On reverse side of photo there are names in position of sitters. From left to right they are: C.P. Jordan - Headmaster, Cr. Spencer-Harper - President Technical Schools Service, Hon. J.S.Bloomfield - Minister of Education, Mr. F.J.Rojo - President, [Blank], Kevin Tatchell - Principal, R. Provan - Past President, J.C.Glare - Vice-President. Portrait of Matthew Richmond, first principal of CTS is hanging on the wall behind.collingwood technical school, school council, nmit -
Bendigo Historical Society Inc.
Newspaper - JENNY FOLEY COLLECTION: GET TOGETHER
Bendigo Advertiser "The way we were" from Monday, April 19, 2004. Get together: Church of Christ's picnic day at Ravenswood, 1947. Some of the family names of those attending are Nan, Tie, Pollock, Hughes, Langley, Jones, Ackland, Thorton, Pearl, Dues, Gillam, Martin, Whitting, Buchan, Mead, Turner, Priest, Legge, Ellis, Crowe, Lowery, Jackel, Felfon, Streader, Tattersal, Buller, Graham, Lacy, Cambridge, Bramley and Greenwood. The Minister was Pastor Robinson. -
Bendigo Historical Society Inc.
Document - LA TROBE UNIVERSITY BENDIGO COLLECTION: THE BIG LAND PUZZLE10-ACRE MIX UP
A newspaper article titled 'The Big Land Puzzle: 10-acre mix up'. This relates to a difference of opinion over what a 10 acre site was bought for. The Principal of the State College of Victoria, Burwood Mr. James Mac Hill, said it wasn't bought for a college to train teachers for handicapped children as was reported by The Minister for Education Mr. Lindsay Thompson. The Principal said the land was being acquired by the State College of Victoria, campus. The article includes a photo of Mr. Hill. Gazette, 1974.bendigo, education, state college of victoria burwood, la trobe university bendigo collection, collection, bendigo teachers' college, mr. james mac hill, land development, state college of victoria burwood campus, tertiary education, mr. lindsay thompson, minister of education -
Bendigo Historical Society Inc.
Document - HARRY BIGGS COLLECTION: OLD POLICE BARRACKS, 6/5/70, 30/4/70
Document. Harry Biggs Collection. 2 letters - (1) On Parliament of Victoria letterhead from R. H. Trethewey MLA to Mr H Biggs dated 6/5/70. He is formally enclosing the reply to his own representations concerning the Old Police Barracks to the Minister of Education L. H. S. Thompson. (2) Mr Thompson acknowledges the representations of Mr Trethewey & states inquiries into the matter are being made. That letter dated 30/4/70.organization, club/society, community, harry biggs collection, old police barracks -
Clunes Museum
Document - EDUCATION REGISTERS, ALBERT J. MILLETT, GOUVERMENT PRINTER
.1 PUPILS REGISTER STATE ELEMENTARY SCHOOL AT CLUNES NO 1552 - 1905 TO 1921 .2 PUPILS REGISTER STATE ELEMENTARY SCHOOL AT CLUNES NO. 1552 - 1921 TO 1937 .3 PUPILS REGISTER STATE PRIMARY SCHOOL, SCHOOL NO 1552, CLUNES H.E.S. 1955 TO 1960 .4 PUPILS REGISTER STATE PRIMARY SCHOOL, SCHOOL NO 1552 1960 TO 1972 .5 COVER FIR .1 TO .4, PRINTED ON FRONT: MINISTER OF EDUCATION VICTORIA COVER FOR ROLL AND EXAMINATION REGISTERstate primary school, pupils register, elementary school clunes