Showing 82 items
matching matters mr.
-
Vision Australia
Text, Association for the Advancement of the Blind quarterly meeting minutes from 18/9/1933 to 17/8/1936, 1933-1936
Minutes of the quarterly meetings of the AAB Committee held at the Kooyong Club House. Minutes contain matters discussed from correspondence and via individual committee members. These include election returns (p.67), additional area at the Kooyong cricket ground so that two matches could be played at once (p.71), and the death of Mr Fred Tilley and injuries to Mrs Driscoll and Miss Stephens due to an accident at Kooyong outside the club house (p.83). 1 paper registerassociation for the advancement of the blind -
Vision Australia
Text, Association for the Advancement of the Blind Finance Committee minutes from 27/11/1967 to 25/5/1970, 1967-1970
Held at the office of the Association for the Blind, these minutes contain information on attendees, meeting chair, apologies, minutes acceptance, matters arising from the minutes, accounts, reports, matters arising from reports, Life Governors, general business and the date of the next meeting. This included the appointment of Reverend A. Wilkins to staff (p.19), the stained glass windows in the Chapel being dedicated as a memorial to the eight founding members (p.41) and switching on of the Guiding Light at Brighton by Mr Bruce Small (p.88). At the end of the book is listed a brief handwritten summary of appointments to Brighton, Ballarat and Bendigo homes and the general/finance committee. 1 paper registerassociation for the advancement of the blind, elanora home (brighton), kelaston home (ballarat), mirridong home (bendigo) -
Vision Australia
Text, Association for the Blind General Committee minutes from 28/2/1972 to 25/2/1974, 1972-1974
Held at the office of the Association for the Blind, these minutes contain information on attendees, meeting chair, apologies, minutes acceptance, matters arising from the minutes, accounts, bequests, reports, matters arising from reports, Life Governors, general business and the date of the next meeting. This included 72 referrals waiting for a first visit and being unble to cope due to present capacity (p.3), the election of Mr J.O. Wicking to be the President of the Association (p.60), and consideration given to training a female mobility instructor thus changing the policy of only employing men for this role (p.82).1 paper registerassociation for the blind -
Vision Australia
Text, AFB Bendigo Branch Committee minutes: 9/2/1981 - 25/9/1986, 1981-1986
Held at the 'Mirridong' Home for the Blind, McIvor Rd, Bendigo which was also the Bendigo Regional Centre, these minutes contain information on attendees, meeting chair, apologies, confirmation of minutes, reports including from Auxiliaries and the Building, house and grounds, matters arising from reports, recommendations, Life Governors awards, general business and the date of the next meeting. They include from 4/10/1984 meeting that Mrs K. Rose advised of the impending resignation of Mr J.O. Wicking as President of the Association for the Blind (AFB) and paid tribute to the close interest he had taken in 'Mirridong' and the support offered during his twelve year term as President. She also reported the resignation of Mr J.W. Wilson from the position of Executive Director of AFB paying tribute to his 32 years of service and particularly with his personal interest and assistance during the development of 'Mirridong'.1 volumemirridong home (bendigo), association for the blind -
Vision Australia
Administrative record - Text, VABW Entertainment Committee minutes: 2/7/1940 - 22/9/1959, 1940-1959
Victorian Association of Braille Writers had subcommittees including the 'Entertainment Committee' which organised concerts, lectures including fortnightly socials and dances throughout the year. These minutes contain information on attendees, meeting chair, apologies, minutes acceptance, matters arising from the minutes, accounts, reports, matters arising from reports, donations, general business and the date of the next meeting. It was noted at the June 4, 1953 meeting that the Braille Cottage at Chelsea had been sold to Mr and Mrs Smith of Ascot Vale, both who are blind readers for £1,950.1 volume of handwritten pages and typewritten sheets glued on to pagesvictorian association of braille writers, recreation -
Vision Australia
Administrative record - Text, Royal Blind Society of NSW Council meeting minutes: 28/7/1997 - 18/12/2001, 1997-2001
These minutes contain information on attendees, meeting chairs, apologies, matters arising out of minutes, correspondence, subscriptions, donations and general business. Reports are also included from Reports for Honorary Treasurer, Chief Executive Officer (CEO), Council Committee, Information Services, Corporate Services, Accommodation Services, Rehabilitation, Marketing, Administration Support and Personnel. 25/8/1997 The President read a letter from the CEO, Mr. J. M. Isaacs formally advising of his resignation to take into effect from 31 December 1997. 24/11/1997 The President reported that Mr. John Landau was to be appointed to the position of CEO. 8/7/1997 The CEO advised the telephone based daily new service using interactive voice response technology developed by RBS was launched. 10/8/1997 it was reported the Queensland Talking Book Service (QTBS) was launched. 21/3/2000 The CEO reported that Ms. Jane Evans had been appointed as General Manager of the National Information Library Service (NILS). 18/4/2000 The CEO reported that one of the reasons for the creation of NILS was to combine the resources of RVIB and RBS to ensure an economical and smooth transition of both collections. 12/11/2001 The CEO reported that a meeting was held to discuss the merger of NILS and Vision Australia Foundation. 1 volume of sheets glued to pagesroyal blind society of nsw, national information library service -
Vision Australia
Administrative record - Text, The Association for the Blind, Blind Members' Council meeting minutes 10/8/1976 to 1/10/1982, 1976-1981
These meetings were held at the Kooyong office and the minutes include Present, Chair, Apologies, Minutes, Matter arising from minutes, Correspondence, Life governors, Election of members, Nominations, Reports from Regional Blind Members groups. Some highlights were: 1/8/1979 Mr Maxwell reported from an article in Sound Magazine which stated that if the present circulation of 2,600 copies of the Large Print Age was not increased it may have to be discontinued. 5/3/1980 a letter of thanks was sent to Sister Toni Cocks for her effort in arranging for Telecom to produce the raised large print telephone dials at no charge to the visually impaired. 2/3/1982 The Secretary reported that the ANZ Bank cheque templates will be launched Australia wide on March 16 and will be on display at the Kooyong Family Fair. 2/7/1982 The Secretary reported that the National Bank has produced a cheque template and that Westpac is proposing to do the same 4/51982 includes a draft copy of AFB philosophies. Minute book for Blind Members Councilassociation for the blind, blind members council -
Vision Australia
Administrative record - Text, The Association for the Blind, Blind Members' Council annual reports and annual general meeting minutes 21/8/1981 to 19/9/1997, 1981-1997
These meetings were held at the Kooyong office and the minutes include Present, Chair, Apologies, Minutes, Matter arising from minutes, Correspondence, Life governors, Election of members, Nominations, Reports from Regional Blind Members groups. Some highlights are: 30/6/1990 under the capable leadership of Mrs Elsie Germon the schools programme has been re-convened. Regular visits are being made to primary schools. Speakers are accompanied by sighted guides. 9/8/1991 Executive Director, Mr John Cook reported merger of the Braille & Talking Book Library with AFB. First radio appeal for 3RPH raising over $30,000, opening of the new Baringa Day Centre at Shepparton. 30/6/1996 the annual report highlighted the Centenary of AFB it was noted that self-help has always been the major emphasis underpinning the work of the Blind Member's Council. The Tilly Aston Fund raised over $1/2 million for the new National Information Centre. The peer support work and monitoring of services, ensures that we give back something to AFB, for the support we receive. BMC representatives made 70 visits across the State. The Council registered the Tilly Aston Rhododendron as a lasting way of acknowledging the work of our founder. 19/9/1997 The Chairman welcomed those present to the second combined meeting of the AFB and the Tilly Aston Customer Council. The Council welcomed the change in Articles and Memorandum of the Association and the formation of the Tilly Aston Customer Council which allowed all customer of the Association automatic membership and input to the monitoring of services. Minute book of Blind Members Council annual reports and general meetingsassociation for the blind, blind members council -
Vision Australia
Text, The Association for the Blind, Blind Members' Council meeting minutes 25/3/1991 to 7/2/1994, 1991-1994
These meetings were held at the Kooyong office and the minutes include Present, Chair, Apologies, Minutes, Matter arising from minutes, Correspondence, Life governors, Election of members, Nominations, Reports from Regional Blind Members groups. Some highlights include: 27/7/1992 Mr Ian Moore reported where possible a volunteer driver will be provided to transport members to and from day centres. Where a volunteer driver is not available a taxi will be arranged at the member's expense, with financial hardship cases assisted. 4/3/26/4/1993 a tactile map of AFB Centres has been produced with the assistance of Mr. Danby for members' information. 31/5/1993 it was reported a donation by Mr John Wicking of $50,000 was received to enable the History of the Association to be written by Mr John Wilson. 1 bookassociation for the blind -
Falls Creek Historical Society
Letter - Site 2 - Removal deferred, 06.05.1963
Bob (Herman) Hymans (a former member of the Royal Netherlands Navy) was born in Bloemendaal, Holland on 30th September 1922. During World War II he fought against the Japanese in the Dutch East Indies (now Indonesia) and was imprisoned in Changi and on the Burma Railway. After gaining qualifications as a Ski Instructor, Bob arrived in Falls Creek in July 1950. Working as an Instructor and Supervisor at Bogong Lodge, Bob decided his future was in accommodation. He was successful in negotiating an indenture for land from the State Electricity Commission (SEC). It took Bob two years to build his Grand Coeur Chalet but, tragically, it was burned down in August 1961. Bob also built the first Chairlift in Australia. This was a single chairlift and the structure was built from wooden electricity poles. He was constantly full of new ideas and proposals for the village. Bob Hymans die on 7th July 2007. This Collection of documents and letters tells the story of Bob's endeavours to develop Falls Creek into the ski village it is today.This letter is significant because it reflects the relationship between Bob Hymans and the General Superintendent of the SEC based at Kiewa regarding his plans for developments at Falls Creek.A letter from the SEC in response to Mr Hymans' request to leave materials in the building on Site 2. The General Superintendent at Kiewa, Mr H.H. C. Williams was perturbed that the material had not been removed as he felt ample time had been allowed to do so. He stated that the site must be vacated prior to the winter of 1964 and that the Committee would be reluctant to consider Mr. Hymans' desire to build on SIte 4 until this matter had been resolved..falls creek tourist area management committee, bob hymans, falls creek administration -
Melton City Libraries
Photograph, Mrs Knox and Beryl Gillespie at the First Hundred Years Celebration of Melton State School 430, 1970
Beryl Knox speaking about early life in Melton. Page 1 1949 – 64 years ago. We began our married life at Melton Sth. The house on the corner of the Exford Rd and Staughton St-- dusty gravel roads, box thorns and noxious weeds everywhere and a sprinkling of houses and vacant land. It was a friendly community consisting of old family names. McDonalds, Blacks, Dodemaide, Cahill, Coopers, Minns, Tinklers, Nesbitts, Cochranes, Wickhams, Exells. Mavis Butler. The home owned by Mr. Robinson and Miss Robinson had been shifted in two parts transported from Diggers Rest and it is still standing 2013. Bruce’s father purchased the house and two adjoining blocks, the Conways built on one and the Rawlinson family on the other block. Eileen still resides there, she was only a baby in a pram and the family had not long arrived from England. The railway line was close to the house and the contents would rattle when heavy steams trains went through, and on a clear frosty night the 1am paper train would echo roar through very loudly when labouring towards the Exford Bridge. Then the two carriage motor train was introduced, this was great for the workers and schoolies who travelled to Melbourne. The train pulled up at the crossing or riding to pick up or drop off. Melva Gillespie (nee Hirt) Bill Cahill delivered the milk by the billy and then in bottles. Len Kennedy (Paul Kennedy’s father, Norma Murrays son) delivered Jongebloeds bread, he always had a sweep going for the Melbourne Cup and raffles for the footy club. Mr. Woodgate owned an old bus and pick up point was the Post Office when there was a Saturday film on a Melton. There were no doctors or dentists in the district. If we need a Doctor we had to travel to Bacchus Marsh or discuss problems over the phone. In later years a Bacchus Marsh Doctor rented the Bluestone building in McKenzie St a couple of days a week. If we needed the Dentist we had to travel to West Footscray or Footscray. We did our banking at “State Savings” then the Miss Minns had the agency and then Bardsleys Store. We travelled to Bacchus Marsh to the National and Commercial banks. Station Rd to Western Highway, now (High Street) was a narrow stretch of bitumen and gravel farmland either side and a couple of farm houses and large gum trees on the properties. Page 2 North of the Railway line Mrs Bessie Jones, mother of Chas and Betty Jones managed the Post Office, next door to her Chas and Betty had the Shell Centre, and later moved the business to Melton. Hughie Nesbitt and mother owned the grocery and hardware store, and I bought my first set of saucepans there. On the opposite side of Station road Mr Coombe owned the fruit shop, and also provided soft drinks and lollies for children. The Chaff Mill was on the corner of Station Rd and Brooklyn Rd. Mr Lumsden was manager and later years Bernie Trethowan and Jack Butler were partners. It finally burnt down and is a Service Station now. Along Brooklyn Rd there were a few houses and Victoria Hall, not a very big hall, but catered for lots of functions, Balls, Fancy Dress, Bazaars, Square Dancing and meetings. The Bacchus Marsh Baptists held Sunday School in the hall. A group of shops were built south of the railway line Molly and Len Skinner managed the Post Office and handled a few essential groceries. Tom McDonald and Ron Lunsberg were the butchers. Mary and Syd Cooper lived next door to us and often in turn would run out of something when we had a baking spree we would borrow or exchange, sugar flour etc over the fence. Mavis and Jack Butler lived there before the Coopers. Bernie and Iris Trethowan lived two doors up. Neighbours were invited into their home to view the first black and white television in Melton Sth. Bill Exell was one of the first Melton Sth farmers to sell his land to developers, the land was idle for years before housing developed. I joined the Melton Valley Golf Club in 1960. The Gun Club as our Club House, an old tin shed consisting a water tank, trestle table and forms and dirt floor. It was a 9 hole course with sand scraps and landscape putting before greens. The Common or parkland was part of the Golf Course. It was open for every ones recreation. Roy Norton an old identity trained his trotters on the Common and wouldn’t clear the track for the golfers. The golfers had to avoid him to continue to play. We had to keep clear when the young youths came in their paddock cars and motorbikes. Over the years the Toolern Creek flooded its banks, water and debri covered the course on one year our first Club house was flooded out. It took several working bees to clean it up. We lived at Melton Sth for 15 years and moved to Melton on the farm “Croxton Park.” The Nixon family farm “Mowbray” adjoined the farm. Bruce worked the land cropping the farm when Mrs Nixon died. Page 3 (page 4 on the handwritten script) Bruce had the first offer to buy, in those days it wasn’t easy to get good bank loans. Part of the land is the Golf Course now and Mr O’Shea purchased the bulk. Moving to Melton was totally different – I became involved with Committees, Scouts, Guides, Mothers Clubs, CWA, Church Op shop (8 years). Melton Amateurs players produced and tutored by Mabel Rogers exerts from Pyjama Game, South Pacific, Carousel - later years a group of ladies did gentle water exercise at Essendon and Station Road swimming pool. I was 20 or so years in Probus. The local followed the football, there was always a Gymkhana on the long weekend in June. The tennis always created a lot of interest during the finals. It didn’t matter which team played the supporters were treated to a cup of tea and leftovers from their afternoon tea. In 1978 were the first residents to move into the Jennings Estate Kurunjang and lived there 31 years and retired 4 years ago into Unit. The amazing changes I have experienced. Merrimu supplied our water, after depending on tanks. The landscape changed completely when developers came in, no more dusty plains \ typed web Sept 2013 McFarlane, Mrs Knox and Beryl Gillespie at the First Hundred Years Celebration of Melton State School 430. The event was held at Mechanics Hall, Melton.local identities, local significant events, education -
Wodonga & District Historical Society Inc
Sign - Name Plate E. Lemke Wodonga
The dairy farm of Eric Lemke and family was located on the Wodonga flats on the Murray River flood plain, west of the Union Bridge. The property was named "Waterford". They ran a large dairy herd (250 cows) and ran five milk carts to Albury to service their customers. The family bought a second property at Wodonga West, on Felltimber Creek, where herds could be rested before calving, and also as an emergency location for milking during times of flood, which sometimes lasted for several weeks at a time. At other times when the cows finished their lactation period at "Waterford" they would be walked to the Lemke property at Wodonga West, for a rest before calving. When the calves were drafted it was a matter of gathering the cows and calves and walking them back home which was an all day job. During the Depression Mr. Lemke took milk to the out-of-work men who slept under the bridges on the causeway and Mrs Lemke would make bread for them. The men would often work on the farm without wages in return for the Lemke's kindness. The Lemke Family are ranked amongst the top early settlers of the district for their perseverance during the hardships of the early days and during the Great Depression. Lemke Road on Gateway Island, Wodonga is named in their honour.This item has local significance because it came from a prominent Wodonga family business.A small metal tag used to label dairy cans on the property of Eric Lemke.E. LEMKE WODONGAe. lemke wodonga, lemke family, wodonga dairy industry, ernie lemke -
Falls Creek Historical Society
Document - Plans To Modify & Extend Chair Lift, 07.11.1960
Bob Hymans Collection Bob (Herman) Hymans (a former member of the Royal Netherlands Navy) was born in Bloemendaal, Holland on 30th September 1922. During World War II he fought against the Japanese in the Dutch East Indies (now Indonesia) and was imprisoned in Changi and on the Burma Railway. After gaining qualifications as a Ski Instructor, Bob arrived in Falls Creek in July 1950. Working as an Instructor and Supervisor at Bogong Lodge, Bob decided his future was in accommodation. He was successful in negotiating an indenture for land from the State Electricity Commission (SEC). It took Bob two years to build his Grand Coeur Chalet but, tragically, it was burned down in August 1961. Bob also built the first Chairlift in Australia. This was a single chairlift and the structure was built from wooden electricity poles. He was constantly full of new ideas and proposals for the village. Bob Hymans die on 7th July 2007. This Collection of documents and letters tells the story of Bob's endeavours to develop Falls Creek into the ski village it is today.This letter is significant because it reflects the relationship between Bob Hymans and the Management Committee.A letter from the Management Committee Falls Creek in relation to his application to modify his chairlift. It states that other people went to the effort of committing proposals to paper and that Bob Hymans should have done the same. The plan submitted by Falls Creek Ski Tows Pty. Ltd. had been accepted. This precluded any of Bob's proposals. It also states that the Committee was reluctant to deal with any further applications from Mr Hymans until he dealt with other outstanding matters. These included lodging a complete proposal for his restaurant and also storage of equipment within the boundaries of his licensed area.falls creek tourist area management committee, chairlift proposals, planning, bob hymans -
Falls Creek Historical Society
Document - Enclosed Copy Of Rule Relating To Garbage At Falls Creek, 10.01.1961
Bob Hymans Collection Bob (Herman) Hymans (a former member of the Royal Netherlands Navy) was born in Bloemendaal, Holland on 30th September 1922. During World War II he fought against the Japanese in the Dutch East Indies (now Indonesia) and was imprisoned in Changi and on the Burma Railway. After gaining qualifications as a Ski Instructor, Bob arrived in Falls Creek in July 1950. Working as an Instructor and Supervisor at Bogong Lodge, Bob decided his future was in accommodation. He was successful in negotiating an indenture for land from the State Electricity Commission (SEC). It took Bob two years to build his Grand Coeur Chalet but, tragically, it was burned down in August 1961. Bob also built the first Chairlift in Australia. This was a single chairlift and the structure was built from wooden electricity poles. He was constantly full of new ideas and proposals for the village. Bob Hymans die on 7th July 2007. This Collection of documents and letters tells the story of Bob's endeavours to develop Falls Creek into the ski village it is today.This letter is significant because it reflects the relationship between Bob Hymans and the Management Committee.A brief letter from the Management Committee enclosed with a copy of the rule relating to Garbage at Falls Creek. It would be appreciated if Mr Hymans was to co-operate with the Committee in this matter.falls creek tourist area management committee, garbage regulations compliance -
Melbourne Legacy
Document, Minutes of Advisory, Tradition & History & Archives Committee 11/6/91, 1991
Minutes of the Archive committee meeting held, 11/6/1991. Minutes confirm those who attended, apologies and matters discussed at the meeting (Club Luncheon, Bulletin Distribution, 50 year certificates, Guest of Honour). Guest of honour under consideration was Mr Bruce Ruxton O.B.E., President of the Victorian R.S.L. Minutes are unsigned. Three horizontal fold marks indicates this document was to be sent to the recipient by the postal service. Email was not available at the time.The existence of the committee evidences Melbourne Legacy's commitment to preserving historical information.White paper, with black type.Legacy symbol top left hand corner. Back of document, L/R.J.Foskett, in black ink.committee, speakers -
Melbourne Tram Museum
Document - Report, Prahran & Malvern Tramway Trust (PMTT), "The Prahran and Malvern Tramways Trust - Report and Statement of Accounts, Nov. 1919
Photocopy of Report - 33 foolscap pages - titled "The Prahran and Malvern Tramways Trust - Report and Statement of Accounts for Twelve Months ending 30th September 1919". Report Shows Mr. Dix at Chairman. Gives listings of Trust Members and Officers, lines opened, Rollingstock, power supply problems, Finance, Operation and General matters, statistics, finance statements, balance sheet and Auditors Report. Appendices includes the Engineers and Manager's Report, Statistics, accounts, funding, auditor reports and maps. Also covers union action, land for a storage site and shelter houses, Lists names of Employees who volunteered for active service, including those who volunteer but did not pass the medical test. Audited by Percy P Cook. See htd2390i2.pdf for the listing of those who served in WW1Has the stamp of the Tramway Museum Society on the rear of the first page.trams, tramways, pmtt, reports, construction, finances, operations, horse trams, tourist tickets, world war 1, unions -
Melbourne Tram Museum
Document - Personal Papers, H. S McComb, "Scher from Jones", May. 1957
Correspondence - carbon copy and background papers, drafts of a letter prepared by H. S. McComb, signed by the Secretary, 14/5/1957, to Mr. J. & S. Shatin Solicitors, regarding a reservation for a tramway on land in Arthur or Station Street Fairfield - not a MMTB or predecessor matter. Includes a handwritten copy of the Certificate of Title.trams, tramways, tramways, proposals, fairfield -
Melbourne Tram Museum
Newspaper, Farrago, John Steed, The Herald, "Tram Lines", Apr. 1969
Newspaper Clipping - set of three clippings adhered to both sides of a sheet of ruled quarto paper with punched holes on the left hand side - various newspapers. .1 - "Tram Lines" - full page - from Melbourne University newspaper - Farrago - Friday April 11 -1969 - Titled "Tram Lines" with a photograph and story of MMTB Driver Cyril Tucker, Kew Depot, written by John Steed. Cyril joined the MMTB in 1922. Gives Cyril's thoughts on being a Trammie, notes the issue of the "scabs" - Tom Pesteranovich and Brooker (see Reg Item 2561). Has two photos and a cartoon sketch of the front of a tram. .2 - "Let's get rid of trams" - Letter to the Herald 11/4/1969 - written by David Crowther - Beaumaris - about trams cluttering the streets - got rid of even in Brisbane. Has a photograph of a tram stuck in traffic in Toorak Road. .3 - "Brisbane Trams Farewell" - Herald - 14/4/`969 - notes closure of Brisbane tram system. Quotes former Transport Minister Mr. Meagher that twice as many buses would be needed. See also Reg Items 2562 and 2693 for further items on this industrial matter.trams, tramways, mmtb, kew depot, unions, drivers, brisbane, letters -
Melbourne Tram Museum
Newspaper, The Emerald Hill, Sandridge and St Kilda Times, "Light Rail: A matter where agreement is hard to get", 23/04/1987 12:00:00 AM
Newspaper cutting from The Emerald Hill, Sandridge and St Kilda Times - 23/4/1987 titled "Light Rail: A matter where agreement is hard to get" about the conversion of the St Kilda and Port Melbourne rail lines to Light Rail. Has three sub-articles, quote the General Manager of The Met Mr. Ed Dotson, Mr Patrick O'Connor Public Transport Users Association about the keeping of the Flinders St link and Mr Noel Willis, the President of the Bayside Public Transport Association who was opposed. Has photos of each of the people involved and a B class tram on route 75 in the Burwood Highway.trams, tramways, light rail, st kilda, port melbourne, conversion, east burwood, route 75 -
Melbourne Tram Museum
Letter, Mr. R. J. Russell, Mr Lewis Russell to Mr. R. A. Spencer, 1938
Letter, Set of two letters, carbon copy, typed by Mr Lewis Russell to Mr. R. A. Spencer while on tour with Mr Bell in 1938. See Reg Item 934 for the report. The two letters give the nitty gritty of the going-on's at the time in the MMTB. .1 - three quarto sheets, stapled in the top left hand corner, dated Monday 2 May, outlining activities at home. The main point is a O'Meara - Eakins appeal which involved extensive legal advice about titles, positions etc. Mr O'Meara title noted as chief draftsman. Notes names of various legal figures such as Mr. Herring KC. Also notes Cr. Gray, Cr. Gorman, Mr. Bell (Jnr?), Mr Cass. Appears that Mr. McGlashan "has been dipping his beak into the flowing bowl" and had been dismissed. Appears he was collecting the fees from the Wattle Park Golf course. Letter continuation of 4 May - appeals still going on, the death of Mr Monsbourgh and dismissal of Mr. Ellis and a 3rd sheet dated 9th May. Reports on drawing up a lease for a Mr. Better, snow and some personal family matters? .2 - letter dated 3/8/1938 Has notes re Mr O'Connor and the benefit society, retiring gratuity, costs, Mr Guice, Mr Richardson. A presentation to the City of Caulfield - Cr Packer and Colonel Cohen, bad press for the MMTB on tram services in the area, Balaclava Road in particular and a report football match between Richmond and Collingwood.Has initials in pencil on base of 2nd pagetrams, tramways, mmtb, letters, publicity, city of caulfield, appeals, personnel, benefit society, gratuity scheme -
Melbourne Tram Museum
Letter, Melbourne & Metropolitan Tramways Board (MMTB), retirement of the MMTB Chairman, Mr. H. Bell, 11/11/1947 12:00:00 AM
Set of letters to and from Mr Lewis Russell MMTB Publicity Officer and Mr. H. Campbell, the Editor The Age, regarding the forthcoming retirement of the MMTB Chairman, Mr. H. Bell, outlining his achievements - financial fares, work and general matters. Good spin.trams, tramways, the age, retirements, board members, chairman, finances, fares -
Bendigo Historical Society Inc.
Document - MISS G ALICE JONES COLLECTION: ACCOUNT
In the Court of Mines for the Mining District of Bendigo at Bendigo. In the matter of New Nell Gwynne Gold Mining Company No Liability and of Part 11 of the Companies Act 1915. Pink paper dated 18 May 1925, December 6, 1924, to May 18, 1925. Details of work for Petitioner's Costs pursuant to Order dated 18 May 1925. and for winding up of the company. Four pages, with all expenses itemized. Total cost £31.12.2.the miss g alice jones collection - account, court of mines, new nell gwynne gold mining company no liability, pt. 11 of the companies act 1915, j. h. abbott & co, bendigo advertiser, mr a g palmer, miller & co pty ltd